DC B23-0260 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it increases the time period by which an action can be taken against the District from six months to one year after injury or damage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of Risk Management Filing Extension Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-07CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-09-18CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-09-18CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-09-14CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-09-11CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-04-26CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0260 Published in the DC Register
2019-04-23CouncilReferred to Committee on Government Operations
2019-04-23CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback