DC B23-0257 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-24 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it requires the Department of Transportation (DDOT) to construct a protected bicycle lane or cycle track on road segments included in the Recommended Bicycle Network in the District of Columbia's Multimodal Long-Range Transportation plan where DDOT is otherwise engaging in road reconstruction, major repair, or curb or gutter replacement on that road segment, unless it is determined that construction would be impractical. Notice is to be provided to affected parties 60 days prior to the proposed construction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mandatory Protected Cycling Lane Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-24CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-10-04CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-09-20CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-09-06CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-04-26CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0257 Published in the DC Register
2019-04-23CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2019-04-23CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback