DC B23-0254 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Law L23-0051, Effective from Feb 21, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2470
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Law L23-0051, Effective from Feb 21, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2470
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-51 updates Title 25 of the D.C. Official Code to include amendments to the District's alcohol licenses and pub permits. Among other things, it increases the Board's hourly rate.
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Control Board License Categories, Endorsements and Hourly and Percentage Rate Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-03 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-03 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Council | Law L23-0051, Effective from Feb 21, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2470 |
2020-01-08 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-01-03 | Council | Act A23-0185 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13 |
2019-12-27 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-12-23 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0185 |
2019-12-12 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 27, 2019 |
2019-12-03 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-12-03 | Council | Amendment (Nadeau) |
2019-11-05 | Council | First Reading |
2019-10-23 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-10-16 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0254 |
2019-06-26 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-05-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-26 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0254 Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-23 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-04-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |