DC B23-0253 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-24 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-24 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it allows a plaintiff to use an alternative method of service of process when serving defendants in motor vehicle cases who reside in the District of Columbia, after providing proof by affidavit that good faith efforts to serve a defendant, pursuant to the rules of the Superior Court, have not succeeded.
Title
Alternative Service of Process on District of Columbia Residents Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-06-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-23 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-04-12 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0253 Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0253 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/42295/Introduction/B23-0253-Introduction.pdf |