DC B23-0245 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-16 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it requires that Advisory Neighborhood Commissions are provided adequate notice and an opportunity to provide recommendations on comprehensive plans prior to the transmission of such plans to the Council for approval.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advisory Neighborhood Commissions Participation In Planning Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-16CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-09-13CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-04-05CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0245 Published in the DC Register
2019-04-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Facilities and Procurement
2019-04-02CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback