DC B23-0237 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it clarifies the applicability of abolishment of rent ceilings. Among other things, it clarifies when a rent increase may be implemented by a housing provider. It defines and regulates discounted rent. It also requires rental advertisements to include the proposed rent charged as well as surcharges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rent Concession Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-24CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-08-14CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-08-11CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-02-28CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-04-05CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0237 Published in the DC Register
2019-04-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization
2019-04-02CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback