DC B23-0216 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - Law L23-0033, Effective from Nov 26, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16311
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Law 23-33 designates Square 3269 bounded by Sheridan Street N.W., 5th Street N.W., 3rd Street N.W., and Van Buren Street N.W. in Ward 4, as Ida B. Wells Middle School. It also disapproves the Master Facilities Plan submitted by the Mayor to the Council. The Council is no longer required to vote on the 10-year Master Facilities Plan concurrently with the Mayor’s capital budget proposal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wells Middle School Designation Act of 2019 (aka "Wells School Designation and Master Facilities Plan Disapproval Amendment Act of 2019")

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-20CouncilLaw L23-0033, Effective from Nov 26, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16311
2019-10-11CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2019-10-11CouncilAct A23-0122 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13152
2019-10-07CouncilReturned from Mayor
2019-10-07CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0122
2019-09-23CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 7, 2019
2019-09-17CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2019-08-29CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2019-07-12CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2019-07-09CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2019-07-09CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2019-07-09CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0216
2019-06-27CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-06-07CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-04-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2019-03-29CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0216 Published in the DC Register
2019-03-25CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback