DC B23-0210 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it allows breweries, wineries, and distilleries to own and operate satellite tavern locations that primarily sell alcohol produced by the manufacturer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Manufacturer's Satellite Taverns Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-05-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-04-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
2019-03-29CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0210 Published in the DC Register
2019-03-18CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback