DC B23-0206 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-24 - Law Number L23-0010 Effective from August 24, 2019, Expires on April 5, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

See "Other Documents" tab for the Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fiscal Year 2019 Revised Local Budget Temporary Act Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-24CouncilLaw Number L23-0010 Effective from August 24, 2019, Expires on April 5, 2020
2019-07-15CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2019-07-12CouncilAct A23-0074 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8069
2019-07-08CouncilSigned with Act Number A23-0074
2019-07-08CouncilEnacted with Act Number A23-0074
2019-06-21CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 8, 2019
2019-06-18CouncilFinal Reading
2019-05-28CouncilFirst Reading
2019-05-28CouncilAmendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson)
2019-05-28CouncilAmendment (Mendelson)
2019-04-02CouncilRetained by the Council
2019-03-20CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback