DC B23-0204 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Act A23-0539 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00039
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Act A23-0539 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00039
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it provides energy efficiency standards for various appliances sold, offered for sale, or installed in the District.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. Please see the Fiscal Impact Statement under Other Documents.
Title
Energy Efficiency Standards Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Council | Act A23-0539 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00039 |
2020-12-23 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-12-22 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0539 |
2020-12-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 24, 2020 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-17 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-11-09 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-09 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0204 |
2019-12-09 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-11-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2019-03-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0204 Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-05 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |