DC B23-0203 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - Law L23-0032, Effective from Nov 26, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16310
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - Law L23-0032, Effective from Nov 26, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16310
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 23-32 expands eligibility of participants in the Grandparent Caregivers Pilot Program to include close relatives that are the adult brother or sister, adult aunt or uncle, or adult nephew or niece of a child.
Title
Close Relative Caregivers Subsidies Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Council | Law L23-0032, Effective from Nov 26, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16310 |
2019-10-11 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2019-10-11 | Council | Act A23-0121 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13146 |
2019-10-07 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-10-07 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0121 |
2019-09-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 7, 2019 |
2019-09-17 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-07-09 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2019-07-03 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-07-01 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0203 |
2019-04-24 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-04-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0203 Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Human Services |
2019-03-19 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |