DC B23-0202 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-03 - Law L23-0097, Effective from Jun 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8038
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-03 - Law L23-0097, Effective from Jun 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8038
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-97 regulates the practice of midwifery and allows Certified Professional Midwives to supervise services at a maternity birthing center. It also establishes the qualifications for licensure and Medicaid reimbursement regarding maternity centers.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Incorporates provisions of Bill 22-784.
Title
Certified Professional Midwife Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Council - Amendment (Gray) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - Postponed to March 3, 2020 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Council - Amendment (Gray) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - Postponed to March 3, 2020 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-03 | Council | Law L23-0097, Effective from Jun 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8038 |
2020-05-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-04-10 | Council | Act A23-0267 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3912 |
2020-04-02 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-03-31 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0267 |
2020-03-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 3, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Council | Amendment (Gray) |
2020-03-03 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-02-04 | Council | Postponed to March 3, 2020 |
2020-01-07 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2019-12-06 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-12-05 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0202 |
2019-04-23 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-03-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0202 Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2019-03-19 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |