DC B23-0192 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Law L23-0061, Effective from Mar 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3076
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Law L23-0061, Effective from Mar 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3076
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-61 removes the annual revenue cap on cottage food businesses and allows all direct sales of cottage food products. It also revises inspection requirements.
Title
Cottage Food Expansion Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-20 | Council | Law L23-0061, Effective from Mar 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3076 |
2020-01-27 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-01-24 | Council | Act A23-0193 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 572 |
2020-01-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-01-16 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0193 |
2020-01-06 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 21, 2020 |
2019-12-17 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-12-03 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2019-11-14 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-11-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0192 |
2019-04-23 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-03-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0192 Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2019-03-19 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |