DC B23-0191 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Law L23-0076, Effective from Apr 16, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4998
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-76 prohibits the retail sale of polystyrene foam food packaging. It also prohibits the sale of loose fill packaging, commonly known as packing peanuts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Polystyrene Food Service and Loose Fill Packaging Prohibition Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-15CouncilLaw L23-0076, Effective from Apr 16, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4998
2020-03-06CouncilAct A23-0223 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2488
2020-03-05CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2020-02-28CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-02-27CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0223
2020-02-14CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 2, 2020
2020-02-04CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-01-07CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2019-12-11CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2019-12-11CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0191
2019-07-10CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-07-05CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-06-21CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-03-22CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0191 Published in the DC Register
2019-03-19CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2019-03-14CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback