DC B23-0183 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Law L23-0060, Effective from Mar 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3075
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-60 exempts certain nonprofits providing vision screenings to children and youth from the certificate of need process. FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children and Youth Vision Screening Amendment Act of 2019 (now known as "Certificate of Need Fee Reduction Amendment Act of 2019")

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-03 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson/T. White) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-03 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20CouncilLaw L23-0060, Effective from Mar 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3075
2020-01-27CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2020-01-24CouncilAct A23-0192 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 568
2020-01-17CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-01-16CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0192
2020-01-06CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 21, 2020
2019-12-17CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2019-12-03CouncilFirst Reading
2019-12-03CouncilAmendment (Mendelson/T. White)
2019-11-14CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2019-11-07CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0183
2019-04-23CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-03-29CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-03-15CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0183 Published in the DC Register
2019-03-05CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2019-03-05CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback