DC B23-0171 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on December 8 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-25 - Act A23-0532 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14774
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 8 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-25 - Act A23-0532 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14774
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill permits a minor of any age to consent to receive a vaccine where the vaccination is recommended by the United States Advisory Committee on Immunization Practices. It also establishes that if a minor is able to comprehend the need for, the nature of, and any significant risks inherent in the medical care then informed consent is established.
Title
Minor Consent for Vaccinations Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-11-17 - Council - Amendment (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-17 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-10 - Council - Postponed to November 17, 2020 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-17 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-10 - Council - Postponed to November 17, 2020 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-25 | Council | Act A23-0532 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14774 |
2020-12-23 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0532 |
2020-12-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 22, 2020 |
2020-11-17 | Council | Amendment (Gray) |
2020-11-17 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-11-10 | Council | Postponed to November 17, 2020 |
2020-10-20 | Council | First Reading |
2020-10-14 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-10-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0171 |
2019-06-26 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-05-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0171 Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2019-03-05 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |