DC B23-0149 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-27 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it prohibits housing providers from inquiring about sources of income and credit history of a prospective tenant. It requires that certain information be provided to potential tenants via posting or in writing prior to obtaining any information or collecting a fee from a prospective tenant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fair Tenant Screening Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-27CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-09-18CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-09-11CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-02-22CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0149 Published in the DC Register
2019-02-19CouncilReferred to Committee on Government Operations
2019-02-19CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback