DC B23-0148 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-24 - Law L23-0113, Effective from Jun 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8974
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Law 23-113 requires that employers who have employees who turn down parking benefits offer a Clean air Transportation Fringe Benefit in an amount equal to or more than the market value of the parking benefit minus the employee's contribution to the parking expense subject to the maximum tax-free benefit allowed by the IRS. If the employee declines both the parking benefit and the Clean-air Transportation Fringe Benefit the employer must increase its financial contribution to the health coverage, and/or the taxable wages, to where the employer contribution equals the market value of the benefit offered. The employer also has the option to pay a Clean Air Compliance fee of $100 per month for each employee who is offered parking benefits, cease to offer parking benefits, or develop a transportation demand management plan that the District of Columbia Department of Transportation has determined is likely to reduce the number of commuter trips employees made by car or taxi the previous year. Incorporates provisions from Bill 22-175. FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Benefits Equity Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-24CouncilLaw L23-0113, Effective from Jun 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8974
2020-05-15CouncilAct A23-0305 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5069
2020-05-12CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2020-05-05CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-04-27CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0305
2020-04-17CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 1, 2020
2020-04-07CouncilFinal Reading
2020-03-03CouncilFirst Reading
2020-03-03CouncilAmendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen)
2020-01-28CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-01-28CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0148
2019-02-22CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0148 Published in the DC Register
2019-02-19CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2019-02-19CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback