DC B23-0138 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Act A23-0021 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 3230, Expires on Jun 13, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifications to Contract No. CW50466 with KPMG, LLP Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifications to Contract No. CW50466 with KPMG, LLP Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22CouncilAct A23-0021 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 3230, Expires on Jun 13, 2019
2019-03-18CouncilReturned from Mayor
2019-03-15CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0021, Expires on Jun 13, 2019
2019-03-05CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 19, 2019
2019-02-19CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2019-02-19CouncilRetained by the Council
2019-02-11CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback