DC B23-0134 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-24 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-24 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it seeks to provide additional safeguards for protected classes against bias-related crimes in the District. It creates the offense of Harassing an Entity. It also expands the types of property on which it is unlawful to display certain emblems that deprive any person or class of persons of equal protection of the law or that intimidate or causes fear in a person or threatens to harm a person or damage property.
Title
Community Harassment Prevention Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-06-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-02-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0134 Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0134 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/41857/Introduction/B23-0134-Introduction.pdf |