DC B23-0133 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Law L23-0085, Effective from May 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5006
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Law L23-0085, Effective from May 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5006
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 23-85 provides a furlough-excepted federal employee is eligible for unemployment benefits during a federal government shutdown. The funds are to be reimbursed by the federal employee if they receive funds from their federal employer in excess of the benefits received during the period for which benefits were paid, however reimbursement may be waived by the Director for good cause.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Supporting Essential Workers Unemployment Insurance Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Council | Law L23-0085, Effective from May 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5006 |
2020-03-27 | Council | Act A23-0254 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3472 |
2020-03-25 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-03-18 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-03-17 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0254 |
2020-03-09 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 23, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-02-04 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-01-29 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-01-29 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0133 |
2019-07-01 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-06-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0133 Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2019-02-05 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |