DC B23-0132 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-09 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it requires Department of Consumer and Regulatory Affairs (DCRA) housing inspectors to be certified to conduct indoor mold assessment and remediation. DCRA shall issue a notice of violation to property owners to remediate indoor mold and impose penalties on owners who do not comply.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Indoor Mold Remediation Enforcement Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-09CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-11-22CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-02-15CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0132 Published in the DC Register
2019-02-05CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2019-02-05CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback