DC B23-0131 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-03 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-03 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it establishes the Ward 7 and Ward 8 Restaurant Incentive Program within the Department of Small and Local Business Development to provide funding, business development assistance, incubation services, and technical assistance to those seeking to open a new restaurant or food establishment in Ward 7 or Ward 8.
Title
Ward 7 and Ward 8 Restaurant Incentive Program Establishment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-05-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0131 Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-02-05 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0131 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/41818/Introduction/B23-0131-Introduction.pdf |