DC B23-0116 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Act A23-0095 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 9722
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it authorizes the acquisition, through the exercise of eminent domain, of certain property located on W Street, NE, for warehousing and storage purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Warehousing And Storage Eminent Domain Authority Act Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-09 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-02CouncilAct A23-0095 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 9722
2019-07-30CouncilTransmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is October 16, 2019
2019-07-24CouncilSigned with Act Number A23-0095
2019-07-24CouncilEnacted with Act Number A23-0095
2019-07-15CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 29, 2019
2019-07-09CouncilFinal Reading CC
2019-06-25CouncilFirst Reading
2019-06-19CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2019-06-19CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0116
2019-05-13CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-04-12CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-02-19CouncilReferred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
2019-02-08CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0116 Published in the DC Register
2019-02-04CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback