DC B23-0113 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
Pending: Council Business and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
Pending: Council Business and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it provides real property tax relief to property located at 3825 South Capitol Street, S.W., and 546 Newcomb Street, S.E.
Title
Unfoldment, Inc. Real Property Tax Relief Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-03-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-02-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0113 Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2019-02-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0113 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/41792/Introduction/B23-0113-Introduction.pdf |