DC B23-0111 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-01 - Act A23-0014 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2469, Expires on May 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-01 - Act A23-0014 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2469, Expires on May 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting Essential Workers Unemployment Insurance Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Supporting Essential Workers Unemployment Insurance Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-01 | Council | Act A23-0014 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2469, Expires on May 26, 2019 |
2019-02-26 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-02-25 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0014, Expires on May 26, 2019 |
2019-02-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-02-05 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) |
2019-02-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-01-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |