DC B23-0107 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0565 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001021
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0565 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001021
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it requires the District to reimburse indirect costs at the same rate a non-profit organization has negotiated to receive for a current federal contract or grant. Modified total direct costs must be at a flat rate if the grant or contract is paid with District funds. It also requires that direct or indirect costs for any grants or contracts with the contracting agency be published by that agency.
Title
Non-Profit Reimbursement Fairness Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0565 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001021 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0565 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-17 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-11-11 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-09 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0107 |
2020-01-28 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-12-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-25 | Council | Referred to Committee on Facilities and Procurement |
2019-10-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Facilities and Procurement |
2019-02-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0107 Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |