DC B23-0094 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it requires that District of Columbia Public Schools and Public Charter Schools provide education on the process of making an anatomical gift. Schools must provide information about the life-saving and life-enhancing effects of organ, eye, and tissue donation in a health class necessary for graduation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Organ, Eye, And Tissue Donation Education Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-06CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-10-21CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-10-04CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-07-12CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-02-05CouncilReferred to Committee on Education
2019-02-01CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0094 Published in the DC Register
2019-01-22CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback