DC B23-0093 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Law Number L23-0111 Effective from Jun 24, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Law 23-111 designates the District government building in Lot 20 in Square 532, bounded by E Street, N.W., Indiana Avenue, N.W., 4th Street, N.W., and 3rd Street, N.W., in Ward 6, as the Marion S. Barry Building.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marion S. Barry Building Designation Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-24CouncilLaw Number L23-0111 Effective from Jun 24, 2020
2020-05-15CouncilAct A23-0303 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5064
2020-05-12CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2020-05-05CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-04-27CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0303
2020-04-17CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 1, 2020
2020-04-07CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-03-03CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2020-02-19CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-02-18CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0093
2020-01-22CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-12-27CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-01-25CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0093 Published in the DC Register
2019-01-22CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2019-01-22CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback