DC B23-0086 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-03 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-03 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it adds the Deanwood Town Center to a list of locations eligible for a tax exemption pursuant to the construction of certain eligible businesses.
Title
Supermarket Tax Incentives Eligible Area Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-05-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-03-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-01-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0086 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2019-01-22 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0086 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/41718/Introduction/B23-0086-Introduction.pdf |