DC B23-0079 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-20 - Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
Pending: Council Business and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-20 - Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
Pending: Council Business and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it increases the homestead exemption for residential properties owned by single families and cooperative housing associations from $67,500 to $125,000.
Pursuant to Rule 350, a motion to recommit the measure to committee was approved on March 5, 2019.
Title
Homestead Exemption Increase Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Council - Pursuant to Rule 350, a motion to recommit the measure to committee was approved at the 3/5/19 Committee of the Whole Work Session (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-09-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-03-05 | Council | Pursuant to Rule 350, a motion to recommit the measure to committee was approved at the 3/5/19 Committee of the Whole Work Session |
2019-02-13 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-02-13 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0079 |
2019-01-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0079 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2019-01-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |