DC B23-0068 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-03 - Law L23-0096, Effective from Jun 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8037
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-03 - Law L23-0096, Effective from Jun 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8037
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-96 designates the 900 Block of Underwood Street, NW., between Georgia Avenue, N.W. and Piney Branch Road, N.W., as Bishop Sherman S. Howard Way.
Title
Bishop Sherman S. Howard Way Designation Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-03 | Council | Law L23-0096, Effective from Jun 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8037 |
2020-05-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-04-10 | Council | Act A23-0266 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3910 |
2020-04-02 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-03-26 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0266 |
2020-03-13 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 27, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-02-04 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-01-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-01-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0068 |
2019-11-26 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-10-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0068 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |