DC B23-0067 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Law Number L23-0057 Effective from March 3, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it expands the right of sexual assault victims to a sexual assault victims advocate and establishes the types of communications that are confidential. It clarifies the duties of the Sexual Assault Response Team as well as the rights of victims when being provided emergency care. Among other things, it expands the definition of a sexual assault victim to include any person who is at least 12 years old. Incorporates provisions from Bill 22-222.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual Assault Victims' Rights Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-05 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20CouncilLaw Number L23-0057 Effective from March 3, 2020
2019-12-06CouncilAct A23-0174 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 15914
2019-12-04CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2019-11-26CouncilSigned with Act Number A23-0174
2019-11-26CouncilEnacted with Act Number A23-0174
2019-11-18CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 4, 2019
2019-11-05CouncilFinal Reading
2019-11-05CouncilAmendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen)
2019-10-22CouncilFirst Reading
2019-10-22CouncilAmendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen)
2019-10-02CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2019-07-11CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0067
2019-01-22CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2019-01-18CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0067 Published in the DC Register
2019-01-08CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback