DC B23-0049 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, it establishes a classroom innovation grant program to provide funding to District of Columbia public and public charter elementary schools to allow classroom teachers to utilize technology to enhance students' learning experience.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Classroom Innovation Grant Program Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-06CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-09-27CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-07-12CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-01-18CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0049 Published in the DC Register
2019-01-08CouncilReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-08CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback