DC B23-0048 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Law L23-0072, Effective from Apr 16, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4994
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Law L23-0072, Effective from Apr 16, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4994
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 23-72 provides that an owner of housing of 4 to 10 units who reduces the number of units pay a fee to the Mayor and that fee be deposited into the Housing Production Trust Fund. It provides that by a specified date all fees above $692,000 annually collected pursuant to the Conversion of Rental Housing to Condominium or Cooperative Status Act of 1980 also be deposited in the Housing Production Trust Fund. It also provides for damages and legal action for tenants whose unit has been repossessed for personal use and occupancy and the landlord has subsequently received rent.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Housing Conversion and Eviction Clarification Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Council - Amendment (R. White) - not considered (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Council - Amendment (R. White) - not considered (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Council | Law L23-0072, Effective from Apr 16, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4994 |
2020-03-06 | Council | Act A23-0219 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2476 |
2020-03-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-02-28 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-02-27 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0219 |
2020-02-18 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-04 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-02-04 | Council | Amendment (Allen) |
2020-01-07 | Council | First Reading |
2020-01-07 | Council | Amendment (R. White) - not considered |
2019-12-31 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-12-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0048 |
2019-07-10 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-06-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-17 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-05-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0048 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-08 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2019-01-08 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |