DC B23-0046 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it requires District of Columbia Public Schools to include in its budget submission to the Council detailed information for each school's funding, a separate line-item for at-risk funding for each school, and a narrative description of programs and services funded by at-risk funds retained by the Chancellor. It also requires that Public Charter Schools make publicly available a report that delineates all programs or services supported by funds allocated during the previous fiscal year. The Public Charter School Board may withhold funds allocated pursuant to this section from a Public Charter School that fails to timely publish the report required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

At-risk School Funding Transparency Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-05-03CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-01-18CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0046 Published in the DC Register
2019-01-08CouncilReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-08CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback