DC B23-0045 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-19 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it creates regulations that govern the removal of bedbugs. It also requires landlords to notify adjoining tenants of infestations. Landlords and pest control operators are required to report infestations to DCRA and among other things are required to provide a 12 month history for a dwelling of prior infestations before signing of a lease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bedbug Control Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-19CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-11-22CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-10-25CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-01-18CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0045 Published in the DC Register
2019-01-08CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2019-01-08CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback