DC B23-0044 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-30 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-30 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it authorizes that upon a judicial finding of an intrafamily offense, the parties may obtain a divorce within 3 months of filing a complaint provided that they have lived separate and apart since the date of the offense. Among other things, it prohibits an award of alimony and any interest in the injured spouse's pension and retirement benefits or attorney fees when there has been a judicial finding of an intrafamily offense.
Title
Alimony Justice for Injured Spouses Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-30 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-10-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0044 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-08 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-01-08 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0044 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/41635/Introduction/B23-0044-Introduction.pdf |