DC B23-0038 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Enrolled on November 20 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 7, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it requires the Office of Human Rights and the Department of Human Resources to develop and provide racial equity training for District employees. Among other things, It requires the Office of Budget and Planning to design and implement a racial equity tool to aid in eliminating disparities based on race. The Mayor is required to include racial equity-related performance measures in the development of an agency's annual performance plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Racial Equity Achieves Results Amendment Act of 2019 (now known as "Racial Equity Achieves Results (REACH) Amendment Act of 2020")

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-10 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-20CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 7, 2020
2020-11-10CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-10-20CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2020-10-20CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0038
2020-07-28CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-07-15CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0038
2019-04-25CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-03-22CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-01-18CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0038 Published in the DC Register
2019-01-08CouncilReferred to Committee on Government Operations
2019-01-08CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback