DC B23-0037 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it includes LGBTQ seniors and seniors with HIV in the definition of groups of greatest social need for the purpose of allocating funds. It also establishes an LGBTQ HIV long-term care bill of rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Care For Lgbtq Seniors And Seniors With Hiv Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-01-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-01-18CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0037 Published in the DC Register
2019-01-08CouncilReferred to Committee on Government Operations
2019-01-08CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback