DC B23-0035 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0564 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0564 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it expands false claims liability to false claims relating to taxation.
Title
False Claims Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0564 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001019 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0564 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-12-01 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2020-11-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-17 | Council | First Reading |
2020-11-17 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0035 |
2019-01-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0035 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-08 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-08 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |