DC B23-0031 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-24 - Law L23-0110, Effective from Jun 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8971
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Law 23-110 provides employees with up to 2 hours of paid leave in order to vote in the District of Columbia elections. FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Paid Leave to Vote Amendment Act of 2019 (aka "Leave to Vote Amendment Act of 2020")

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - Council - Amendment #1 (Allen) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-24CouncilLaw L23-0110, Effective from Jun 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8971
2020-05-15CouncilAct A23-0301 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5057
2020-05-12CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2020-05-05CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-04-27CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0301
2020-04-17CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 1, 2020
2020-04-07CouncilFinal Reading
2020-04-07CouncilAmendment #1 (Allen)
2020-03-03CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2020-02-26CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-02-25CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0031
2019-06-13CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-05-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-01-18CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0031 Published in the DC Register
2019-01-08CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2019-01-08CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback