DC B23-0022 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Law L23-0009, Effective from Aug 31, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12338
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Law 23-9 designates the interior section of the public alley system within Square 1090, bounded by 16th Street, S.E., D Street, S.E., 17th Street, S.E., and E Street, S.E. in Ward 6, as Adelaide Alley.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adelaide Alley Designation Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-25 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-20CouncilLaw L23-0009, Effective from Aug 31, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12338
2019-07-22CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2019-07-19CouncilAct A23-0079 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8264
2019-07-16CouncilReturned from Mayor
2019-07-16CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0079
2019-07-01CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 16, 2019
2019-06-25CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2019-06-10CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0022
2019-06-04CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2019-06-04CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2019-01-22CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2019-01-11CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0022 Published in the DC Register
2019-01-07CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback