DC B23-0013 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-18 - Act A23-0001 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 600, Expires on Apr 11, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-18 - Act A23-0001 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 600, Expires on Apr 11, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Let Our Vows Endure Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Let Our Vows Endure Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-08 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-08 - Council - Amendment (Todd) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-08 - Council - Amendment (Todd) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-18 | Council | Act A23-0001 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 600, Expires on Apr 11, 2019 |
2019-01-11 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-01-11 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0001, Expires on Apr 11, 2019 |
2019-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 25, 2019 |
2019-01-08 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-01-08 | Council | Amendment (Todd) |
2019-01-08 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-01-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |