DC B23-0001 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Law L23-0127, Effective from Aug 27, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 10918
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Law L23-0127, Effective from Aug 27, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 10918
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Chairman Mendelson as submitted by the Mayor.
Law 23-127 reflects text amendments to the Framework Element of the Comprehensive Plan. It reflects current planning priorities and best practices, and refines land use descriptions.
See Bill 22-663 for additional reference.
Title
Comprehensive Plan Amendment Act of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-08 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-11 | Council | Law L23-0127, Effective from Aug 27, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 10918 |
2020-07-16 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-02-14 | Council | Act A23-0217 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1360 |
2020-02-11 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-02-11 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0217 |
2020-01-31 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 14, 2020 |
2019-10-08 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-10-08 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) |
2019-10-08 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2019-07-09 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2019-07-09 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0001 |
2019-01-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0001 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-08 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
2018-03-20 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |