DC B22-1056 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Act A22-0549, Expires on March 25, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 223
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Act A22-0549, Expires on March 25, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 223
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Neighborhood Safety And Engagement Fund Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2018
Title
Neighborhood Safety And Engagement Fund Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-11 | Council | Act A22-0549, Expires on March 25, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 223 |
2018-12-26 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0549 |
2018-12-26 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0549 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-12-13 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 28, 2018 |
2018-12-04 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-12-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |