DC B22-1008 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill exempts certain properties owned or leased by Shaed School, LLC from taxation. The properties include 5601 East Capitol, LLC, Mamie D. Lee, and St. Paul on Fourth Street, Inc.
Title
Charter School Property Tax Clarification Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-11-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-11-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-11-19 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-11-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-26 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-1008 Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-16 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2018-10-12 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-1008 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/41103/B22-1008-Introduction.pdf |