DC B22-1006 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-09 - Act A22-0497, Expires on January 29, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12325
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modificationno. 2 To Contract No. Dcpl-2018-c-0034a With Baker & Taylor Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modificationno. 2 To Contract No. Dcpl-2018-c-0034a With Baker & Taylor Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-16 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-09CouncilAct A22-0497, Expires on January 29, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12325
2018-10-31CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0497
2018-10-31CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0497
2018-10-18CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 1, 2018
2018-10-16CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-10-16CouncilRetained by the Council
2018-10-09CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback