DC B22-1001 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-23 - Signed with Act Number A22-0595
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-23 - Signed with Act Number A22-0595
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health Insurance Marketplace Improvement Act Of 2018
Title
Health Insurance Marketplace Improvement Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-23 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0595 |
2019-01-23 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0595 |
2019-01-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 30, 2019 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-12-04 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-11-29 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-19 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-1001 |
2018-11-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-10-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-12 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-1001 Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2018-10-02 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |