DC B22-0990 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-20 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-20 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill closes a portion of a public street adjacent to Squares 3760 and 3766, bounded by Riggs Road, Chillum Place, and Kennedy Street in Northeast Washington D.C. in Ward 4.
Title
Closing Of A Portion Of South Dakota Avenue, N.e., Adjacent To Squares 3760 And 3766 Act Of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-20 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-11-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0990 Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2018-10-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0990 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/41034/B22-0990-Introduction.pdf |